+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2007
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 25, 2007
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Edward D. Maloney
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Kirk W. Dillard
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Edward D. Maloney
- Sponsor Removed Sen. John O. Jones
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Arrived in House
On February 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kirk W. Dillard
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 23, 2007
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Carole Pankau
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2007
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. John O. Jones
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Carole Pankau
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Cronin
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 8, 2007: SB0138 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 08, 2007
+ − Sponsors (46)
Type:
Primary Sponsor