+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0137
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2016
On June 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 016-000-000
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 11, 2015
- Second Reading
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2015
- Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 008-000-000
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Environment and Conservation
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 225 ILCS 725/8a - from Ch. 96 1/2, par. 5413
- 225 ILCS 725/8d new -
+ − Votes (4)
May 21, 2015: SB1377 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 21, 2015
May 12, 2015: SB1377 - Agriculture & Conservation - May 12, 2015
April 14, 2015: SB1377 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 14, 2015
March 5, 2015: SB1377 - Environment and Conservation - Mar 05, 2015
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor