+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Appropriations III
On May 5, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Appropriations III
On April 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Appropriations III
On April 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Appropriations III
On April 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Appropriations III
On March 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 2-10 The following deadlines are not applicable (March 17, 2005 Senate Bills Out of Committee & April 15, 2005 Senate Bills Third Reading)
- Postponed - Appropriations III
On March 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Appropriations III
On March 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Appropriations III
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor