+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2007
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 25, 2007
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On March 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2007
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2007
- Do Pass Education; 010-000-000
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On February 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. M. Maggie Crotty
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 105 ILCS 5/19-7.5 new -
- 105 ILCS 5/19-8 - from Ch. 122, par. 19-8
- 105 ILCS 5/19-9 - from Ch. 122, par. 19-9
- 105 ILCS 5/19-11 - from Ch. 122, par. 19-11
- 105 ILCS 5/19-13 - from Ch. 122, par. 19-13