+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On April 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10(e) to April 9, 2003.
On March 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Sen. Bill Brady
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass Insurance & Pensions; 010-000-000
On March 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Pension Note Filed As Introduced
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance & Pensions
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 40 ILCS 5/13-401 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 13-401
- 40 ILCS 5/13-402 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 13-402
- 40 ILCS 5/13-403 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 13-403
- 30 ILCS 805/8.27 new -
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor