+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Special Issues (TR)
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Brian W. Stewart
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Special Issues (TR)
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Transportation
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Transportation
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Brian W. Stewart
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 30 ILCS 105/8.3 - from Ch. 127, par. 144.3
- 430 ILCS 30/2 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 700-2
- 430 ILCS 30/3 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 700-3
- 625 ILCS 5/18b-101 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 18b-101
- 625 ILCS 5/18b-102 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 18b-102
- 625 ILCS 5/18b-104 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 18b-104
- 625 ILCS 5/18b-109 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 18b-109
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor