+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Criminal Law
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Criminal Law
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor