+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 27, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2011
On May 20, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2011
On May 13, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 20, 2011
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On May 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On April 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 4, 2011
On April 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sullivan
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2011
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Agriculture and Conservation; 008-000-000
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture and Conservation
On March 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 3, 2011
- Second Reading
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John M. Sullivan
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2011
- Do Pass Agriculture and Conservation; 010-000-000
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Kotowski
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Makes changes in a provision regarding the possession limits of river otter.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 520 ILCS 5/2.30 - from Ch. 61, par. 2.30
- 520 ILCS 5/2.30b new -
- 520 ILCS 5/2.33a - from Ch. 61, par. 2.33a