+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On July 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0289
- Effective Date July 22, 2003
- Governor Approved
On June 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 013-000-000
On May 5, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Public Utilities Committee
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 31, 2003
On April 10, 2003 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On March 26, 2003 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On March 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2003
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Collins
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted Environment & Energy; 010-000-000
On March 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment & Energy
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
On March 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Filed from the Illinois Department of Revenue
On March 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Filed from the Illinois Department of Commerce & Community Affairs
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Sen. Steven J. Rauschenberger
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 6, 2003
- Do Pass Environment & Energy; 011-000-000
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Environment & Energy
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Prohibits gas or electric utilities from disconnecting service to participants, rather than persons eligible for assistance, under the Energy Assistance Act of 1989 for nonpayment of a bill or deposit where gas or electricity is used as the primary source or to operate the primary source of heating.
+ − Statute Amended
- 220 ILCS 5/8-206 - from Ch. 111 2/3, par. 8-206
+ − Votes (2)
May 21, 2003: SB1330 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 21, 2003
March 26, 2003: SB1330 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 26, 2003
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor