+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Tax Exemptions and Credits
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 35 ILCS 5/229 new -
- 35 ILCS 735/3-3 - from Ch. 120, par. 2603-3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor