+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On July 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 31, 2011
- Do Pass Transportation; 011-000-000
On March 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 8, 2011
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Transportation
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Transportation
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor