+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
On July 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Appropriations- Human Services
- Assigned to Appropriations
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor