+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (64)
- Session Sine Die
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2009
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01-June 15, 2007
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 15, 2007
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 8, 2007
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-001-002
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Robert S. Molaro
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Robert S. Molaro
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Robert S. Molaro
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Robert S. Molaro
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2007
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 25, 2007
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elaine Nekritz
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Schoenberg
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2007
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 010-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2007
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2007
- Do Pass as Amended Executive; 012-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
+ − Adopted Amendments (5)
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act, the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act, the Lobbyist Registration Act, the Illinois Procurement Code, and the Illinois Pension Code. Makes changes with respect to the following: statements of economic interests; ultimate jurisdictional authorities; ethics training; ethics officers; the revolving door prohibition; public service announcements; collective bargaining; lobbying; emergency procurements; holdover leases; contract disclosures; the Illinois Procurement Bulletin; lease renewals; State contract conflicts of interests; bond issuances; and investment advisers, fiduciaries, and prohibited activities relating to pension funds, retirement systems, and the Illinois State Board of Investment. Preempts home rule with respect to investment adviser and consultant contracts. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3
Makes technical corrections.
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 5 ILCS 420/4A-105 - from Ch. 127, par. 604A-105
- 30 ILCS 500/50-13 -
- 30 ILCS 500/50-20 -
- 30 ILCS 500/50-21 new -