+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On October 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 40 ILCS 5/2-117 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 2-117
- 40 ILCS 5/14-103.05 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 14-103.05
- 40 ILCS 5/15-134 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 15-134
- 40 ILCS 5/16-123 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-123
- 40 ILCS 5/18-120 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 18-120
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor