+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On August 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Labor
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Labor
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
- Second Reading
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017
- Do Pass Labor; 011-003-000
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Labor
- Postponed - Labor
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Labor
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Labor
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Labor
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
+ − Proposed Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
March 29, 2017: SB1296 - Labor
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor