+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On December 22, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 032-016-002
- Verified
On March 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 27, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2003
- Do Pass Appropriations I; 009-000-000
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Appropriations I
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter