+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (64)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-1067
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 1, 2006
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 033-023-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 007-005-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01-May 4, 2006
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 062-049-002
- Correctional Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- Fiscal Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- Balanced Budget Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 5, 2006
- State Debt Impact Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- Judicial Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- Pension Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- Home Rule Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed As Amended by HA 1
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Ron Stephens; As Amended by HA 1
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue Committee; 010-002-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue Committee; 012-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Revenue Committee
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 30, 2006
- First Reading
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 008-004-000
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Lightford
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Donne E. Trotter
- Third Reading - Passed; 031-012-006
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 7, 2006
- Approved for Consideration Rules
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Extended to January 9, 2007
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Extended to December 31, 2005
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 13, 2005
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 17, 2005
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 15, 2005
- Do Pass Labor; 006-002-000
- Assigned to Labor
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Requires that each notice of a contract contain a statement to encourage prospective vendors to hire qualified veterans or residents discharged from any Illinois adult correctional center. Provides that a chief procurement officer may encourage prospective vendors to consider hiring qualified veterans or residents discharged from any Illinois adult correctional center. Requires the Department of Central Management Services to submit an annual report concerning the hiring of qualified veterans or residents discharged from any Illinois adult correctional centers. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates income tax credits for wages paid to eligible offenders and for wages paid to qualified veterans. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Department of Corrections has the power to provide a pre-release job preparation program for inmates at Illinois adult correctional centers. In a Section concerning the restoration of rights, includes various Acts for which a certificate of relief from disabilities may be issued for a license or certification. In an Article concerning certificates of relief from disabilities, provides that the definition of "eligible offender" includes persons convicted not more than twice (now, not more than once) of a felony. Effective immediately.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Requires that each notice of a contract contain a statement to encourage prospective vendors to hire qualified veterans or residents discharged from any Illinois adult correctional center. Provides that a chief procurement officer may encourage prospective vendors to consider hiring qualified veterans or residents discharged from any Illinois adult correctional center. Requires the Department of Central Management Services to submit an annual report concerning the hiring of qualified veterans or residents discharged from any Illinois adult correctional centers. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates income tax credits for wages paid to eligible offenders and for wages paid to qualified veterans. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Department of Corrections has the power to provide a pre-release job preparation program for inmates at Illinois adult correctional centers. In a Section concerning the restoration of rights, includes various Acts for which a certificate of relief from disabilities may be issued for a license or certification. In an Article concerning certificates of relief from disabilities, provides that the definition of "eligible offender" includes persons convicted not more than twice (now, not more than once) of a felony. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 820 ILCS 55/10 - from Ch. 48, par. 2860