+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2019
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 007-000-000
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019
- Second Reading
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
- Do Pass Education; 014-000-000
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
May 8, 2019: SB1272 - Elem Sec Ed: Adm., Lic. & Charter
April 10, 2019: SB1272 - Third Reading
March 19, 2019: SB1272 - Education
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor