+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0211
- Effective Date August 10, 2009
- Governor Approved
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 7, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 008-000-000
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Renée Kosel
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2009
- Second Reading
On February 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 4, 2009
- Do Pass Pensions and Investments; 009-000-000
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Pensions and Investments
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi
+ − Statute Amended
- 40 ILCS 5/7-132 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 7-132