+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-0477
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2006
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Labor Committee; 018-000-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
- Assigned to Labor Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2005
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted Labor; 008-000-000
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Forby
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Extended to December 31, 2005
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 13, 2005
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 17, 2005
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 15, 2005
- Do Pass Labor; 006-002-000
- Assigned to Labor
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Safety Inspection and Education Act. Changes, adds, and reorganizes provisions concerning: workplace inspections by the Department of Labor; complaints by employees or employee organizations; discrimination; civil and criminal penalties and reduction of civil penalties; procedures in contested cases; access to records of employers; scheduling of workplace inspections; safety education programs; laboratory services; and other matters. Amends the Health and Safety Act. Provides that the Act applies to public employers (instead of employers in general). Changes, adds, and reorganizes provisions concerning: records and reports of work-related death, injuries, and illnesses; adoption of federal workplace safety and health standards as State standards; granting variances from State workplace health and safety standards; and other matters.