+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-General Services Committee; 004-003-000
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On March 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Verified
- Third Reading - Passed; 032-016-002
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 27, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass Appropriations II; 010-000-000
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Appropriations II
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick Welch