+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On January 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On November 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 4, 2014
On November 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 19, 2014
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2014
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 23, 2014
On May 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 16, 2014
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 8, 2014
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 1, 2014
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 7, 2014
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Assignments
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013
- Second Reading
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013
- Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor