+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2009
On December 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2007
On March 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed April 18, 2007
- Third Reading - Consideration Postponed
On March 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2007
- Second Reading
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2007
- Do Pass Revenue; 006-004-000
On March 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor