+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (51)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-0655
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2006
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Adopted Commerce & Economic Development; 006-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Commerce & Economic Development
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01-May 27, 2005.
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted International Trade & Commerce Committee; 012-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to International Trade & Commerce Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2005
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Michelle Chavez
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David E. Miller
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate International Trade & Commerce Committee; 014-001-000
- Assigned to International Trade & Commerce Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Cullerton
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce & Economic Development; 008-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Commerce & Economic Development
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 8, 2005
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 6, 2005
- Do Pass Commerce & Economic Development; 007-002-000
- Postponed - Commerce & Economic Development
- Postponed - Commerce & Economic Development
- Assigned to Commerce & Economic Development
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Further amends the Business Corporation Act of 1983. Provides that a corporation shall honor a request by a shareholder to be physically present at a meeting of the shareholders, where space permits, and shall not exclude a shareholder from being physically present at a meeting of shareholders in an effort to censor, silence, or otherwise curtail the shareholder from expressing dissent or otherwise exercising his or her freedom of expression. Provides that any officer, agent, or corporation that does not honor the request of a shareholder to be physically present at a meeting or in any way excludes any shareholder from being physically present at a meeting shall be liable to such shareholder, in a penalty of up to 10% of the value of the shares owned by such shareholder, in addition to any other damages or remedy afforded him or her by law.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Further amends the Business Corporation Act of 1983. Provides that a corporation shall honor a request by a shareholder to be physically present at a meeting of the shareholders, where space permits, and shall not exclude a shareholder from being physically present at a meeting of shareholders in an effort to censor, silence, or otherwise curtail the shareholder from expressing dissent or otherwise exercising his or her freedom of expression. Provides that any officer, agent, or corporation that does not honor the request of a shareholder to be physically present at a meeting or in any way excludes any shareholder from being physically present at a meeting shall be liable to such shareholder, in a penalty of up to 10% of the value of the shares owned by such shareholder, in addition to any other damages or remedy afforded him or her by law.
+ − Statute Amended
- 805 ILCS 5/1.01 - from Ch. 32, par. 1.01