+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On December 15, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 13, 2009
On November 18, 2008 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jim Sacia
On May 31, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 28, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue Committee; 008-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Revenue Committee
On May 23, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2008
On May 22, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 23, 2008
On May 31, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2007
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 25, 2007
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
On April 9, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 30, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On March 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2007
- Second Reading
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2007
- Do Pass Revenue; 007-000-000
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. In the Use Tax Act, provides that the manufacturing and assembly exemption shall be awarded to the taxpayer in the form of a credit memorandum. Provides that the Department of Revenue shall submit a report to the General Assembly containing certain information concerning credit memorandums awarded for production related tangible personal property. Amends the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Deletes references to an exemption for production related tangible personal property. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 35 ILCS 105/3-50 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.3-50
- 35 ILCS 120/2-45 - from Ch. 120, par. 441-45
+ − Vote
March 30, 2007: SB1248 - Third Reading - Friday, March 30, 2007
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor