+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On September 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue
- Postponed - Revenue
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue
- Postponed - Revenue
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor