+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0454
- Effective Date August 27, 2007
- Governor Approved
On June 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 30, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 17, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue Committee; 011-000-000
On May 14, 2007 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue Committee; 003-000-000
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
On March 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2007
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2007
- Do Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 009-000-000
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development
On February 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 35 ILCS 5/201 - from Ch. 120, par. 2-201
- 415 ILCS 5/25d-3 -
- 415 ILCS 5/58.2 -
- 415 ILCS 5/58.14 -
- 415 ILCS 5/58.14a new -