+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0453
- Effective Date August 27, 2007
- Governor Approved
On June 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 30, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
On May 24, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 9, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 8, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Environmental Health Committee; 009-000-000
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Eddie Washington
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Environmental Health Committee
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tom Cross
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
On March 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2007
- Second Reading
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2007
- Do Pass Environment and Energy; 011-000-000
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Environment and Energy
On February 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2007: SB1242 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 30, 2007
March 20, 2007: SB1242 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 20, 2007
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor