+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On April 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10(e) to April 9, 2003.
On March 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass Appropriations II; 010-000-000
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Appropriations II
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick Welch
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor