+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Licensed Activities
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Licensed Activities
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Licensed Activities
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- New Act -
- 5 ILCS 80/4.32 new -
- 730 ILCS 5/5-5-5 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-5-5
- 225 ILCS 310/Act rep. -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor