+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (86)
- Total Veto Stands
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Mike Smiddy
- Override Governor Veto - House Lost 068-034-009
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Placed on Calendar Total Veto August 25, 2015
- Arrived in House
- Override Governor Veto - Senate Passed 038-015-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Don Harmon
- Placed Calendar Total Veto August 5, 2015
- Governor Vetoed
- Sent to the Governor
- Motion Withdrawn Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Senate Concurs 038-017-000
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. David Koehler
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. David Koehler
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon
- Senate Concurs 038-017-000
- Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. John J. Cullerton
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 038-017-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 038-017-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ron Sandack
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Mike Smiddy
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ron Sandack
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ron Sandack
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Rep. Mike Smiddy Moved Note Requests are Inapplicable
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Mike Smiddy
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Mike Smiddy
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ron Sandack
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Mike Smiddy
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Prevailed 067-042-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Request as Amended is Inapplicable
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Prevailed 067-042-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 30, 2015
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-025-003
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Request as Amended is Inapplicable
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Prevailed 067-042-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Prevailed 067-042-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Request as Amended is Inapplicable
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Request as Amended is Inapplicable
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 016-009-000
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Neil Anderson
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Smiddy
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015
- Motion Prevailed
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015
- Arrived in House
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2015
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015
- Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000
- Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Public Labor Relations Act. Provides that with respect to collective bargaining agreements expiring on or after June 30, 2015 but before July 1, 2019 between the State and units of employees of State agencies which are not resolved by the expiration date: mediation shall be initiated within 30 days from the expiration of the agreement or the effective date of the amendatory Act; if a mediator is unable to bring the parties to agreement through conciliation within 30 days of the commencement of mediation or an additional period to which the parties agree, either party may initiate impasse arbitration procedures except that, in determining the jurisdiction or authority of the arbitration panel, arbitration procedures are deemed to have been initiated before the commencement of any fiscal year occurring after the expiration of the agreement; an expired agreement is in full force and effect and conditions of employment may not be changed by action of either party without the consent of the other until a successor agreement is adopted; and the right to strike is considered waived until the convening of the arbitration hearing. Effective immediately.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Creates the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Act. Contains only a short title provision.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- New Act -
- 5 ILCS 315/7 - from Ch. 48, par. 1607