+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (70)
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0626
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Senate Concurs 037-015-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 037-015-000
- Effective Date February 5, 2014
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 6
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 007-004-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 062-048-000
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 6 - February 5, 2014
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 6 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On December 20, 2013 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On December 3, 2013 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives
On December 2, 2013 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 20, 2013
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2013
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2013
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2013
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2013
- Do Pass Revenue; 010-000-000
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
+ − Adopted Amendments (6)
House Amendment 006
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the State Budget Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Governor shall, as soon as possible and not later than the fourth Wednesday in March in 2014 (March 26, 2014), submit a State budget. Effective immediately.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning a special tax levy.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 605 ILCS 5/6-602 - from Ch. 121, par. 6-602
- 15 ILCS 20/50-5 -
+ − Votes (4)
February 5, 2014: HCA0001 - Concurrence - Wednesday, February 05, 2014
February 5, 2014: HFA0006 - Concurrence - Wednesday, February 05, 2014
February 4, 2014: SB1227 - Third Reading - Tuesday, February 04, 2014
April 17, 2013: SB1227 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 17, 2013
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor