+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (55)
On August 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0421
- Effective Date July 1, 2018
- Governor Approved
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 053-001-000
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 008-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Education
On May 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2017
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
On May 28, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-011-000
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
- Second Reading
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 6, 2017
- Do Pass as Amended Education; 012-000-000
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Education
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
- Postponed - Education
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
- Postponed - Education
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
+ − Votes (7)
May 31, 2017: HCA0001 - Concurrence
May 30, 2017: HCA0001 - Education
May 28, 2017: SB1223 - Third Reading
May 24, 2017: SB1223 - Elem Sec Ed: School Curric Policies
May 3, 2017: SB1223 - Third Reading
April 4, 2017: SB1223 - Education
April 4, 2017: SCA0002 - Education
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor