+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (52)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0316
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 9, 2019
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 31, 2019
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Emil Jones, III
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 005-000-000
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
- Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Jones
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 005-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2019
- Do Pass Licensed Activities; 006-000-000
- Assigned to Licensed Activities
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 002
In provisions amending the Regulatory Sunset Act, provides for the repeal of the Medical Practice Act of 1987 on January 1, 2022 (rather than January 1, 2025). In provisions of the Medical Practice Act of 1987 requiring the Department to provide a certified shorthand reporter to take down the testimony and preserve a record of proceedings at hearings, specifies that those tasks be done in accordance with the applicable provisions of the Department of Professional Regulation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal date of the Medical Practice Act of 1987 from December 31, 2019 to January 1, 2025. Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987. Removes obsolete language regarding certain transfers of money from the Illinois State Medical Disciplinary Fund to the Local Government Tax Fund. In provisions concerning disposition and collection of fees, removes language imposing fees for wall certificates and for the rosters of persons licensed as physicians. Provides that notice of certain proceedings before the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation or the Medical Disciplinary Board may be served by personal delivery, email to the respondent's email address of record, or mail to the respondent's address of record (rather than by personal delivery or by certified or registered mail). Provides that hearing officers may administer oaths at any hearing that the Medical Disciplinary Board or Department is authorized by law to conduct. Adds the report of the hearing officer and exhibits to the list of items that constitute the record of the proceedings for a hearing involving disciplinary action. Removes language requiring the Department to furnish a copy of the record to any person interested in the hearing and to provide the name and contact information for the certified shorthand reporter who transcribed the testimony. Requires the Disciplinary Board to serve to an accused person a written report of the Medical Disciplinary Board's findings and recommendations either personally or by mail or email (rather than personally or by registered or certified mail). Effective immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 5 ILCS 80/4.39 -
- 5 ILCS 80/4.29 rep. -
- 225 ILCS 60/21 - from Ch. 111, par. 4400-21
- 225 ILCS 60/36 - from Ch. 111, par. 4400-36
- 225 ILCS 60/38 - from Ch. 111, par. 4400-38
- 225 ILCS 60/39 - from Ch. 111, par. 4400-39
- 225 ILCS 60/40 - from Ch. 111, par. 4400-40
- 5 ILCS 80/4.35 -
- 5 ILCS 80/4.32 -