+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On August 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-0429
- Effective Date August 2, 2005
- Governor Approved
On June 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 26, 2005 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On May 20, 2005 in the House:
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Table Amendment - Prevailed 111-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2005
On May 19, 2005 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Table Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
On May 12, 2005 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Table Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Robert Rita
On May 11, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 5, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 4, 2005 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Human Services Committee
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
On April 20, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On April 11, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 8, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On April 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 8, 2005
- Second Reading
On March 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 6, 2005
- Do Pass as Amended Health & Human Services; 009-000-000
On March 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health & Human Services
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Edward D. Maloney
On March 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Health & Human Services
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Edward D. Maloney
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Further amends the Home Health Agency Licensing Act, and amends the Assisted Living and Shared Housing Act and the Nursing Home Care Act. Provides that a home health agency, assisted living or shared housing establishment, or nursing home may arrange for the administration of vaccines as an alternative to administering the vaccines.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Further amends the Home Health Agency Licensing Act, and amends the Assisted Living and Shared Housing Act and the Nursing Home Care Act. Provides that a home health agency, assisted living or shared housing establishment, or nursing home may arrange for the administration of vaccines as an alternative to administering the vaccines.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
May 26, 2005: SB1220 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 26, 2005
May 20, 2005: HCA0001 - Amendment - Friday, May 20, 2005
April 8, 2005: SB1220 - Third Reading - Friday, April 08, 2005
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor