+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 5, 2019
- Second Reading
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 21, 2019
- Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 55 ILCS 5/2-1003 - from Ch. 34, par. 2-1003
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2019: SB1218 - Third Reading
February 20, 2019: SB1218 - Local Government
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor