+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- To Revenue Subcommittee on Tax Credits
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Revenue
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
+ − Statute Amended
- 35 ILCS 5/201 - from Ch. 120, par. 2-201