+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On October 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Tax Credits
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor