+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On August 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 27, 2009
- Do Pass Appropriations II; 007-003-000
On May 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Appropriations II
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor