+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2007
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 25, 2007
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On February 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 23, 2007
- Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000
- Second Reading
- Fiscal Note Requested by Sen. Chris Lauzen
- Fiscal Note Filed from the Illinois Department of Revenue.
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2007
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
February 23, 2007: SB0012 - Third Reading - Friday, February 23, 2007
+ − Sponsors (129)
Type:
Primary Sponsor