+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0394
- Effective Date August 23, 2007
- Governor Approved
On June 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 29, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On May 24, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 17, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 004-000-000
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee
On April 20, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On March 30, 2007 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On March 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2007
- Second Reading
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 8, 2007
- Do Pass as Amended Pensions and Investments; 010-000-000
On March 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Pensions and Investments
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Pensions and Investments
On February 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Requires the trustee to adopt an investment policy. Provides that the policy shall include training for Board members.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 29, 2007: SB1179 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 29, 2007
March 30, 2007: SB1179 - Third Reading - Friday, March 30, 2007
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor