+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0276
- Effective Date January 1, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 8, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-023-003
On April 14, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 10, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 009-000-003
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On March 26, 2003 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Edward J. Acevedo
On March 21, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 20, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 19, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins