+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (73)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-1045
- Effective Date March 27, 2009
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Public Health; 006-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Public Health
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. David Koehler
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Greg Harris
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) December 15, 2008; 01
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2008
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. David E. Miller
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 10, 2008
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 2, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 12, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 5, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 5, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 24, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 17, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 10, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 4, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 31, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 22, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 15, 2007
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 8, 2007
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Balanced Budget Note Filed
- Fiscal Note Filed
- Pension Note Filed
- Home Rule Note Filed
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
- State Debt Impact Note Filed
- Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed
- Judicial Note Filed
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Registration and Regulation Committee; 021-000-000
- Assigned to Registration and Regulation Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 045-009-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2007
- Second Reading
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Do Pass as Amended Environment and Energy; 009-002-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2007
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment and Energy
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
- Assigned to Environment and Energy
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the bill as introduced with the following changes. Permits a unit of local government to require homeowners who maintain a private sewage disposal system within the unit of local government to provide verification, no more frequently than once every 3 years (rather than on an annual basis), to the unit of local government of a valid contract with a licensed private sewage disposal system installation contractor. Provides that no additional fee may be charged for such verification. Effective immediately.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the bill as introduced with the following changes. Permits a unit of local government to require homeowners who maintain a private sewage disposal system within the unit of local government to provide verification, no more frequently than once every 3 years (rather than on an annual basis), to the unit of local government of a valid contract with a licensed private sewage disposal system installation contractor. Provides that no additional fee may be charged for such verification. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 225 ILCS 225/10 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 116.310