+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On August 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0541
- Effective Date August 23, 2019
- Governor Approved
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 080-036-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Removed from Short Debate Status
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
- Arrived in House
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 037-012-000
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2019
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2019
- Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 006-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Licensed Activities
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Licensed Activities
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. In the Illinois Explosives Act, allows a person lawfully admitted for permanent residence (rather than a person admitted for permanent residence) to qualify for licensure. In the Coal Mining Act, restores references to United States citizenship and adds references to persons lawfully admitted for permanent residence. Adds an immediate effective date.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (17)
- 20 ILCS 5/5-725 new -
- 225 ILCS 210/2005 - from Ch. 96 1/2, par. 1-2005
- 225 ILCS 320/10 - from Ch. 111, par. 1109
- 225 ILCS 320/17 - from Ch. 111, par. 1116
- 225 ILCS 345/9 - from Ch. 111, par. 7110
- 225 ILCS 635/3.2 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 242.2
- 225 ILCS 705/4.01 - from Ch. 96 1/2, par. 401
- 225 ILCS 705/5.01 - from Ch. 96 1/2, par. 501
- 225 ILCS 705/6.01 - from Ch. 96 1/2, par. 601
- 225 ILCS 705/7.02 - from Ch. 96 1/2, par. 702
- 225 ILCS 705/7.04 - from Ch. 96 1/2, par. 704
- 225 ILCS 705/27.01 - from Ch. 96 1/2, par. 2701
- 225 ILCS 705/27.02 - from Ch. 96 1/2, par. 2702
- 225 ILCS 705/32.02 - from Ch. 96 1/2, par. 3202
- 225 ILCS 705/32.03 - from Ch. 96 1/2, par. 3203
- 235 ILCS 5/6-2 - from Ch. 43, par. 120
- 240 ILCS 5/19 - from Ch. 17, par. 1469
+ − Votes (5)
May 28, 2019: SB1166 - Third Reading
May 15, 2019: SB1166 - Executive
March 21, 2019: SB1166 - Third Reading
March 13, 2019: SB1166 - Licensed Activities
March 13, 2019: SCA0001 - Licensed Activities
+ − Sponsors (63)
Type:
Primary Sponsor