+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On June 1, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 28, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 012-000-000
On May 27, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On May 23, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2003
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 23, 2003
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Winters
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 9, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 16, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 011-000-002
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On March 26, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 25, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On March 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 19, 2003
- Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 725 ILCS 5/110-7 - from Ch. 38, par. 110-7