+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - State Government
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - State Government
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor