+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0621
- Effective Date December 15, 2003
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Motion to Reconsider Vote Withdrawn
- Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. William E. Peterson
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Adopted Transportation; 009-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Transportation
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. George P. Shadid
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01 - May 23, 2003
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-004-002
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 23, 2003
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dan Reitz
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee; 015-001-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Assigned to Transportation and Motor Vehicles Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted Transportation; 008-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Shadid
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2003
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. George P. Shadid
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 19, 2003
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2003
- Do Pass Transportation; 010-000-000
- Assigned to Transportation
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. George P. Shadid
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the original bill, with changes. Provides that the required actions must be taken within 21 (rather than 15) days after payment is received. Provides that a violation is a petty offense (rather than a Class B misdemeanor for a first violation and a Class A misdemeanor for a second or subsequent violation) and the offender must pay a fine of $250 (rather than a fine of $250 for each violation). Provides that, in addition to any other penalty, a lienholder who fails to meet the new requirements is liable to the person or entity that was supposed to receive the release or certificate for $250 plus attorney fees and court costs. Provides that an action under the provision may be brought in small claims court or in any other appropriate court. Effective immediately.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the original bill, with changes. Provides that the required actions must be taken within 21 (rather than 15) days after payment is received. Provides that a violation is a petty offense (rather than a Class B misdemeanor for a first violation and a Class A misdemeanor for a second or subsequent violation) and the offender must pay a fine of $250 (rather than a fine of $250 for each violation). Provides that, in addition to any other penalty, a lienholder who fails to meet the new requirements is liable to the person or entity that was supposed to receive the release or certificate for $250 plus attorney fees and court costs. Provides that an action under the provision may be brought in small claims court or in any other appropriate court. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 625 ILCS 5/3-205 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 3-205