+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On November 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Extended to January 9, 2007
On July 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On April 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Extended to December 31, 2005
On April 12, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 13, 2005
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2005
- Second Reading
On March 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 6, 2005
- Do Pass Judiciary; 008-001-001
On March 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, Jr.
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
+ − Statute Amended
- 705 ILCS 35/1 - from Ch. 37, par. 72.1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor