+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (48)
On August 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0567
- Effective Date August 20, 2003
- Governor Approved
On June 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
On May 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Adopted Local Government; 006-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Local Government
On May 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dave Syverson
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 02 - May 23, 2003
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 02
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-001
On May 20, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 23, 2003
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Winters
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted - Lost Local Government Committee; 000-011-002
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Local Government Committee
On April 29, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Winters
On April 10, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Local Government Committee; 019-000-000
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Local Government Committee
On March 26, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 25, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On March 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 19, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 6, 2003
- Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 007-000-000
On March 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Local Government
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Local Government
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
On February 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the Village of Rockton (instead of any municipality located in a county with population not in excess of 1,000,000) has the power to dissolve and acquire all of the assets and responsibilities of a sanitary district under certain conditions and allows the corporate authorities of the Village of Rockton to vote to dissolve and acquire the existing sanitary district after providing at least 60 days' notice to the sanitary district. Make other changes.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2
Makes a technical change.
+ − Statute Amended
- 70 ILCS 2405/27 - from Ch. 42, par. 317i
+ − Votes (3)
May 29, 2003: HFA0002 - Concurrence - Thursday, May 29, 2003
May 21, 2003: SB1124 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 21, 2003
March 24, 2003: SB1124 - Third Reading - Monday, March 24, 2003
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor