+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On August 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0200
- Effective Date January 1, 2020
- Governor Approved
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 007-000-000
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- To Commercial Law Subcommittee
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 009-000-000
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bush
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2019
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2019
- Do Pass Local Government; 008-000-000
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Local Government
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: Limits the provisions to residential property of 1 acre or less. Adds provisions requiring the county to file with the circuit court a petition for an order authorizing the abatement of the condition that is causing the threat to health or safety, including provisions concerning notice and hearing regarding the petition. Makes other changes.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (6)
May 21, 2019: SB1114 - Third Reading
May 9, 2019: SB1114 - Judiciary - Civil
May 8, 2019: SB1114 - Commercial Law Subcommittee
April 10, 2019: SB1114 - Third Reading
April 10, 2019: SFA0001 - Local Government
March 13, 2019: SB1114 - Local Government
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor